VT H0218 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Signed by Governor on April 19, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Signed by Governor on April 19, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to lead poisoning prevention
Title
An act relating to lead poisoning prevention
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Rosenquist [R] | Rep. Jessica Brumsted [D] | Rep. James Gregoire [R] | Rep. Sandy Haas [D] |
Rep. Logan Nicoll [D] | Rep. Daniel Noyes [D] | Rep. Marybeth Redmond [D] | Rep. Theresa Wood [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | House | Signed by Governor on April 19, 2019 |
2019-04-15 | House | Delivered to the Governor on April 15, 2019 |
2019-04-19 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on April 19, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2019-04-05 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Ingram for Committee on Health and Welfare, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-04-04 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-02-19 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-02-15 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-02-15 | House | Rep. Rosenquist of Georgia reported for the committee on Human Services |
2019-02-15 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-02-13 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |