VT H0216 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-31 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-31 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to Lifeline benefits
Title
An act relating to Lifeline benefits
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Pugh [D] | Rep. Stephen Carr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-31 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-03-29 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-03-28 | House | Report of Committee on Energy and Technology agreed to. |
2017-03-28 | House | Rep. Dakin of Colchester recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-28 | House | Rep. Yantachka of Charlotte reported for the committee on Energy and Technology |
2017-03-28 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-03-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2017-02-09 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Energy and Technology |