VT H0215 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the Office of the Child Advocate
Title
An act relating to the Office of the Child Advocate
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Noyes [D] | Rep. Ann Pugh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |
2020-03-11 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2020-03-10 | House | Report of Committee on Human Services agreed to. |
2020-03-10 | House | Rep. Redmond of Essex reported for the committee on Human Services |
2020-03-10 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-02-13 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |