VT H0205 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 28, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the regulation of neonicotinoid pesticides

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the regulation of neonicotinoid pesticides

Sponsors

Rep. Joseph Troiano [D]Rep. Amy Sheldon [D]Rep. Janet Ancel [D]Rep. Peter Anthony [D]
Rep. Sarita Austin [D]Rep. John Bartholomew [D]Rep. Matt Birong [D]Rep. Thomas Bock [D]
Rep. Timothy Briglin [D]Rep. Cynthia Browning [D]Rep. Jessica Brumsted [D]Rep. Mollie Burke [D]
Rep. Scott Campbell [D]Rep. James Carroll [D]Rep. Robin Chesnut-Tangerman [D]Rep. Annmarie Christensen [D]
Rep. Kevin Christie [D]Rep. Brian Cina [D]Rep. Sara Coffey [D]Rep. Selene Colburn [D]
Rep. Harold Colston [D]Rep. Peter Conlon [D]Rep. Mari Cordes [D]Rep. Kari Dolan [D]
Rep. Johannah Donovan [D]Rep. David Durfee [D]Rep. Robert Forguites [D]Rep. John Gannon [D]
Rep. Marcia Gardner [D]Rep. Diana Gonzalez [D]Rep. Sandy Haas [D]Rep. Matthew Hill [D]
Rep. Philip Hooper [D]Rep. Robert Hooper [D]Rep. Lori Houghton [D]Rep. Mary Howard [D]
Rep. Kimberly Jessup [D]Rep. John Killacky [D]Rep. Martin LaLonde [D]Rep. Diane Lanpher [D]
Rep. Paul Lefebvre [R]Rep. Terence Macaig [D]Rep. James Masland [D]Rep. Mike McCarthy [D]
Rep. Curtis McCormack [D]Rep. James McCullough [D]Rep. Michael Mrowicki [D]Rep. Daniel Noyes [D]
Rep. John O'Brien [D]Rep. Carol Ode [D]Rep. Kelly Pajala [I]Rep. Avram Patt [D]
Rep. David Potter [D]Rep. Zachariah Ralph [D]Rep. Marybeth Redmond [D]Rep. Lucy Rogers [D]
Rep. Robin Scheu [D]Rep. Trevor Squirrell [D]Rep. Mary Sullivan [D]Rep. George Till [D]
Rep. Maida Townsend [D]Rep. Tommy Walz [D]Rep. Rebecca White [D]Rep. David Yacovone [D]
Rep. Michael Yantachka [D]

Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on May 28, 2019
2019-05-28HouseSigned by Governor on May 28, 2019
2019-05-22HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 22, 2019
2019-05-13SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2019-05-10HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2019-05-08HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2019-05-08SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2019-05-08SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0
2019-05-08SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-05-07Senate3rd reading ordered
2019-05-07SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture agreed to
2019-05-07SenateReported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-07SenateReported favorably by Senator Pearson for Committee on Finance
2019-05-07SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Pollina for Committee on Agriculture
2019-05-07SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-07SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2019-05-07SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
2019-05-07SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2019-05-06SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-06SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2019-05-06SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
2019-05-06SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-05-02SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2019-05-02SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2019-05-02SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
2019-05-02SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-04-23SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2019-04-23SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
2019-04-23SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-03-29SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture
2019-03-27HouseRead Third time and Passed
2019-03-26HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-03-26HouseReport of Committee on Agriculture and Forestry as amended agreed to
2019-03-26HouseReport of the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-26HouseReport of the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means
2019-03-26HouseRep. Conquest of Newbury recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2019-03-26HouseRep. Browning of Arlington recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
2019-03-26HouseRep. Bartholomew of Hartland reported for the committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2019-03-26HouseRead Second Time
2019-03-21HouseRep. Bartholomew of Hartland moved to commit bill to the committee on Appropriations which was agreed to.
2019-03-21HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Bartholomew of Hartland
2019-03-15HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2019-02-12HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback