VT H0199 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 6, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to validating legal instruments used in connection with the conveyance of real estate

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to validating legal instruments used in connection with the conveyance of real estate

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-07SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on May 6, 2021
2021-05-06HouseSigned by Governor on May 6, 2021
2021-04-30HouseDelivered to the Governor on April 30, 2021
2021-04-27HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence
2021-04-23SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence
2021-04-23SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2021-04-22SenateReported favorably by Senator Nitka for Committee on Judiciary, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2021-04-22SenateFavorable report by Committee on Judiciary
2021-04-22SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2021-04-21SenateFavorable report by Committee on Judiciary
2021-04-21SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-03-10SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-02-26HouseRead Third time and Passed
2021-02-25HouseThird Reading Ordered
2021-02-25HouseRep. Leffler of Enosburgh reported for the Committee on Judiciary
2021-02-25HouseRead Second Time
2021-02-05HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback