VT H0183 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 8, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to sexual violence

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to sexual violence

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-21SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on June 8, 2021
2021-05-21HouseSigned by Governor on June 8, 2021
2021-05-21HouseDelivered to the Governor on June 2, 2021
2021-05-21SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2021-05-19HouseSenate proposal of amendment concurred in
2021-05-19HouseDivision results Yays 104, Nays 20
2021-05-19HouseDivision demanded
2021-05-19HouseRules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2021-05-18HouseSenate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2021-05-14SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2021-05-14SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2021-05-13Senate3rd reading ordered
2021-05-13SenateProposal of amendment  by Committee on Judiciary, as amended, agreed to
2021-05-13SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary amended as moved by Senator(s) Lyons, Campion, Chittenden, Hooker, Perchlik, and Terenzini
2021-05-13SenateProposal of amendment by Senator(s) Lyons, Campion, Chittenden, Hooker, Perchlik, and Terenzini; text
2021-05-13SenateReported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations
2021-05-13SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
2021-05-13SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Lyons, Campion, Chittenden, Hooker, Perchlik, and Terenzini
2021-05-13SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2021-05-13SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2021-05-13SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2021-05-12SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Lyons, Campion, Chittenden, Hooker, Perchlik, and Terenzini
2021-05-12SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2021-05-12SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2021-05-12SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-05-04SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2021-05-04SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2021-05-04SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-03-30SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-03-25HouseRead Third time and passed
2021-03-25HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Rogers of Waterville agreed to
2021-03-24HouseThird Reading ordered
2021-03-24HouseDivision results Yeas 131; Nays 0
2021-03-24HouseDivision demanded
2021-03-24HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary as amended agreed to
2021-03-24HouseRep. Colburn of Burlington moved to amend the report of the Committee on Judiciary, which was agreed to
2021-03-24HouseReport of the Committee on Judiciary amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations
2021-03-24HouseRep. Squirrell of Underhill recommended for the Committee on Appropriations
2021-03-24HouseRep. Colburn of Burlington reported for the Committee on Judiciary
2021-03-24HouseRead Second time
2021-03-16HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2021-02-03HouseRead First Time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback