VT H0175 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Roll Call, requested by Senator Brock, Failed -- Needed 22 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 20, Nays = 9
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Roll Call, requested by Senator Brock, Failed -- Needed 22 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 20, Nays = 9
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the beverage container redemption system
Title
An act relating to the beverage container redemption system
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Brock, Failed -- Needed 22 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 20, Nays = 9 (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Pearson, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 17, Nays = 13 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Ingalls, Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 17, Nays = 11 (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 99, Nays = 46 (Y: 99 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 64, Nays = 79 (Y: 64 N: 79 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Pearson, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 17, Nays = 13 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Ingalls, Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 17, Nays = 11 (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 99, Nays = 46 (Y: 99 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 64, Nays = 79 (Y: 64 N: 79 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | Roll Call, requested by Senator Brock, Failed -- Needed 22 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 20, Nays = 9 |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Senator Balint moved to suspend rules to message the bill to the House forthwith, NOT agreed to |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Pearson, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 17, Nays = 13 |
2022-05-11 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Ingalls, Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 17, Nays = 11 |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Division of the Senate Yeas 17, Nays 11 |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, as amended, agreed to |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Bray, MacDonald, and McCormack; text |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Reported without recommendation by Senator Nitka for Committee on Appropriations |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Pearson for Committee on Finance |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Bray for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Bray and MacDonald |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Reported without recommendation by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2022-05-10 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Reported without recommendation by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-04-16 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2021-04-16 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Gregoire of Fairfield disagreed to |
2021-04-16 | House | Division results Yeas 51, nays 83 |
2021-04-16 | House | Division demanded |
2021-04-16 | House | Rep. Gregoire of Fairfield moved to amend the bill |
2021-04-16 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Morris of Springfield agreed to |
2021-04-16 | House | Second division of amendment agreed to |
2021-04-16 | House | First division of amendment agreed to |
2021-04-16 | House | Which was agreed to |
2021-04-16 | House | Rep. Harrison of Chittenden moved to amend the amendment offered by Rep. Morris of Springfield |
2021-04-16 | House | Rep. Harrison of Chittenden asked that the question be divided |
2021-04-16 | House | Rep. Morris of Springfield moved to amend the bill |
2021-04-15 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2021-04-15 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 99, Nays = 46 |
2021-04-15 | House | Rep. McCoy of Poultney demanded yeas and nays |
2021-04-15 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Marcotte of Coventry, Brennan of Colchester, and Gregoire of Fairfield disagreed to |
2021-04-15 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 64, Nays = 79 |
2021-04-15 | House | Rep. Harrison of Chittenden demanded yeas and nays |
2021-04-15 | House | Rep. Marcotte of Coventry, Brennan of Colchester, and Gregoire of Fairfield moved to amend the bill |
2021-04-15 | House | Report of Committee on Appropriations agreed to |
2021-04-15 | House | Report of Committee on Ways and Means agreed to, as substituted |
2021-04-15 | House | Report of Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife agreed to |
2021-04-15 | House | Rep. Squirrell of Underhill recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-15 | House | Rep. Bartholomew of Hartland moved to substitute an amendment which was agreed to |
2021-04-15 | House | Rep. Ode of Burlington recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-04-15 | House | Rep. Morris of Springfield reported for the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife |
2021-04-15 | House | Read Second time |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife |