VT H0167 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to alternative approaches to addressing low-level illicit drug use

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to alternative approaches to addressing low-level illicit drug use

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseAction postponed indefinitely
2018-04-27HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 68 of 134 to Pass -- Yeas = 106, Nays = 28
2018-04-27HouseCalled Up on motion of Rep. Gonzalez of Winooski and placed on the Calendar for Action on April 27, 2018
2017-05-18HouseOrdered to Lie upon motion of Rep. Turner of Milton
2017-05-02HouseRep. Conquest of Newbury moved to postpone action until May 3, 2017 which was agreed to
2017-05-01HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-05-01HouseRep. Grad of Moretown moved to postpone action until May 2, 2017
2017-04-28HouseAction Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Grad of Moretown
2017-04-27HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-04-25SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-04-25SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2017-04-24SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-04-21Senate3rd reading ordered
2017-04-21SenateProposal of amendment agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 9
2017-04-21SenateDivision Yeas 23, Nays 7 - 3/4ths majority attained, as requested by Senator Mullin
2017-04-21SenateMotion agreed to
2017-04-21SenateSenator Sears moved to suspend rules to allow consideration of a non-germane amendment
2017-04-21SenatePoint of order sustained by the President
2017-04-21SenatePoint of order raised by Senator Flory on ground that proposed amendment was not germane
2017-04-21SenateProposal of amendment by Senator(s) White, Pearson, Rodgers, and Sears; text
2017-04-21SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2017-04-21SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Judiciary
2017-04-21SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) White, Rodgers, and Sears
2017-04-21SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2017-04-21SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-04-20SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-23SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-22HousePassed
2017-03-22HouseRead Third time
2017-03-21HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-03-21HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary agreed to.
2017-03-21HouseRep. Burditt of West Rutland reported for the committee on Judiciary
2017-03-21HouseRead Second Time
2017-02-01HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback