VT H0157 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Ingalls, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 9
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to registration of construction contractors

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to registration of construction contractors

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Ingalls, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 9
2021-06-24SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2021-06-23SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2021-05-21Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sirotkin, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 20, Nays = 10
2021-05-21SenateProposal of amendment  by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, as amended, agreed to
2021-05-21SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs amended as moved by Senator(s) Sirotkin, Clarkson, and Bray
2021-05-21SenateProposal of amendment by Senator(s) Sirotkin, Clarkson, and Bray; text
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably by Senator Baruth for Committee on Appropriations
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Finance
2021-05-21SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Clarkson for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2021-05-21SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sirotkin, Clarkson, and Bray
2021-05-21SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2021-05-21SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2021-05-21SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2021-05-21SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2021-05-20SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2021-05-20SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2021-05-20SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2021-05-20SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-05-18SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2021-05-18SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2021-05-18SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2021-05-18SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-05-14SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2021-05-14SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2021-05-14SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-04-29SenateReferred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
2021-04-09SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
2021-04-07HouseRead Third time and passed
2021-04-07HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Stevens of Waterbury agreed to
2021-04-07HouseSecond division of amendment agreed to
2021-04-07HouseFirst division of amendment agreed to
2021-04-07HouseWhich was agreed to
2021-04-07HouseRep. McCoy of Poultney asked that the question be divided
2021-04-07HouseRep. Stevens of Waterbury moved to amend the bill
2021-04-07HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Shaw of Pittsford agreed to
2021-04-06HouseThird Reading ordered
2021-04-06HouseReport of Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs as amended agreed to
2021-04-06HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 75 of 149 to Pass -- Yeas = 97, Nays = 52
2021-04-06HouseRep. Troiano of Stannard demanded yeas and nays
2021-04-06HouseDivision results Yeas 53; Nays 82
2021-04-06HouseRep. Higley of Lowell moved to commit the bill to the Committee on Government Operations which was disagreed to
2021-04-06HouseRep. Higley of Lowell moved to amend the report of the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs, which was disagreed to
2021-04-06HouseReport of the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means as substituted
2021-04-06HouseReport of the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations
2021-04-06HouseRep. Townsend of South Burlington recommended for the Committee on Appropriations
2021-04-06HouseRep. Masland of Thetford moved to substitute an amendment which was agreed to
2021-04-06HouseRep. Masland of Thetford recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means
2021-04-06HouseRep. Troiano of Stannard reported for the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs
2021-04-06HouseRead Second time
2021-04-01HouseRep. Stevens of Waterbury moved to postpone action until April 6, 2021 which was agreed to
2021-03-23HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2021-03-16HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2021-01-29HouseRead First Time and referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback