VT H0152 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - House message: Governor approved bill on 5/1/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the Vermont Revised Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the Vermont Revised Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on 5/1/2017
2017-05-01HouseSigned by Governor on May 1, 2017
2017-04-11HouseSenate Message, Passed in Concurrence
2017-04-07SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence
2017-04-06SenateReported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2017-04-07SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-04-06SenateFavorable report by Committee on Judiciary
2017-04-06SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2017-04-05SenateFavorable report by Committee on Judiciary
2017-04-05SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-04-04SenateFavorable report by Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-23SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-22HousePassed
2017-03-22HouseRead Third time
2017-03-21HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-03-21HouseRep. Lalonde of South Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary
2017-03-21HouseRead Second Time
2017-01-31HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback