VT H0144 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-18 - Recommitted to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Degree
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-18 - Recommitted to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Degree
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the membership of the Nuclear Decommissioning Citizens Advisory Panel
Title
An act relating to the membership of the Nuclear Decommissioning Citizens Advisory Panel
Sponsors
Rep. David Deen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Degree |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senator Sears requested & granted leave to withdraw motion |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senator Sears motion to commit bill to Committee on Government Operations |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Degree for Committee on Finance |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2017-04-18 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-03-02 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2017-03-01 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-03-01 | House | Report of Committee on Natural Resources, Fish and Wildlife agreed to. |
2017-03-01 | House | Rep. Squirrell of Underhill reported for the committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife |
2017-03-01 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-01-27 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife |