VT H0133 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 23, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 23, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to miscellaneous energy subjects
Title
An act relating to miscellaneous energy subjects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 23, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | House | Signed by Governor on May 23, 2019 |
2019-05-17 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2019-05-15 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2019-05-15 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-13 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-10 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-07 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Patt of Worcester, Briglin of Thetford, Chesnut-Tangerman of Middletown Springs, Campbell of St. Johnsbury, Higley of Lowell, Scheuermann of Stowe, Sibilia of Dover, and Yantachka of Charlotte |
2019-05-02 | House | Action postponed until May 7, 2019 as moved by Rep. Patt of Worcester |
2019-04-30 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-04-26 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-04-25 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance, as amended, agreed to |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Ashe for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Campion for Committee on Finance |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2019-04-25 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-03-20 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-03-19 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-19 | House | Report of Committee on Energy and Technology agreed to. |
2019-03-19 | House | Rep. Patt of Worcester reported for the committee on Energy and Technology |
2019-03-19 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-01-31 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Energy and Technology |