VT H0107 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 80-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-17 - Committee of Conference Report
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to paid family and medical leave

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to paid family and medical leave

Sponsors

Rep. Robin Scheu [D]Rep. Sarah Copeland-Hanzas [D]Rep. Samuel Young [D]Rep. Janet Ancel [D]
Rep. Peter Anthony [D]Rep. Sarita Austin [D]Rep. John Bartholomew [D]Rep. Matt Birong [D]
Rep. Thomas Bock [D]Rep. Timothy Briglin [D]Rep. Jessica Brumsted [D]Rep. Mollie Burke [D]
Rep. Scott Campbell [D]Rep. James Carroll [D]Rep. Robin Chesnut-Tangerman [D]Rep. Annmarie Christensen [D]
Rep. Kevin Christie [D]Rep. Brian Cina [D]Rep. Sara Coffey [D]Rep. Selene Colburn [D]
Rep. Harold Colston [D]Rep. Peter Conlon [D]Rep. Mari Cordes [D]Rep. Carl Demrow [D]
Rep. Kari Dolan [D]Rep. Johannah Donovan [D]Rep. David Durfee [D]Rep. Caleb Elder [D]
Rep. Alice Emmons [D]Rep. Marcia Gardner [D]Rep. Dylan Giambatista [D]Rep. Diana Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Maxine Grad [D]Rep. Sandy Haas [D]Rep. Nader Hashim [D]Rep. Matthew Hill [D]
Rep. Mary Hooper [D]Rep. Philip Hooper [D]Rep. Robert Hooper [D]Rep. Lori Houghton [D]
Rep. Mary Howard [D]Rep. Kathleen James [D]Rep. Kimberly Jessup [D]Rep. John Killacky [D]
Rep. Warren Kitzmiller [D]Rep. Emilie Kornheiser [D]Rep. Jill Krowinski [D]Rep. Martin LaLonde [D]
Rep. Diane Lanpher [D]Rep. William Lippert [D]Rep. Emily Long [D]Rep. Terence Macaig [D]
Rep. James Masland [D]Rep. Mike McCarthy [D]Rep. Curtis McCormack [D]Rep. James McCullough [D]
Rep. Michael Mrowicki [D]Rep. William Notte [D]Rep. Daniel Noyes [D]Rep. Jean O'Sullivan [D]
Rep. Carol Ode [D]Rep. Carolyn Partridge [D]Rep. Avram Patt [D]Rep. Ann Pugh [D]
Rep. Barbara Rachelson [D]Rep. Zachariah Ralph [D]Rep. Marybeth Redmond [D]Rep. Amy Sheldon [D]
Rep. Trevor Squirrell [D]Rep. Thomas Stevens [D]Rep. Mary Sullivan [D]Rep. Randall Szott [D]
Rep. Tristan Toleno [D]Rep. Maida Townsend [D]Rep. Joseph Troiano [D]Rep. Tommy Walz [D]
Rep. Rebecca White [D]Rep. Theresa Wood [D]Rep. David Yacovone [D]Rep. Michael Yantachka [D]

Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-17SenateCommittee of Conference Report
2020-01-16SenateCommittee of Conference Report
2020-01-16SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-01-10SenateCommittee of Conference appointed: Senators Sirotkin, Clarkson, and Balint
2020-01-09SenateHouse message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed
2020-01-08HouseSpeaker appointed Stevens of Waterbury, Scheu of Middlebury and Gonzalez of Winooski as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
2020-01-08HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Stevens of Waterbury
2020-01-07HouseAction Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Stevens of Waterbury
2019-05-24HouseSenate Message, adopted in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2019-05-24SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza
2019-05-24SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2019-05-24SenateProposal of amendment agreed to
2019-05-24SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) Sirotkin, Balint, and Clarkson motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
2019-05-24SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2019-05-23SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2019-05-22SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2019-05-21SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2019-05-20SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2019-05-17SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2019-05-16SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-05-15Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Benning, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 19, Nays = 10
2019-05-15SenateProposal of amendment  by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, as amended, agreed to
2019-05-15SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs amended as recommended by Committee on Finance
2019-05-15SenateReported without recommendation by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-15SenateReported favorably by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Finance with proposal of amendment
2019-05-15SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2019-05-15SenateReported without recommendation by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-15SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2019-05-15SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2019-05-15SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2019-05-14SenateReported without recommendation by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-14SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2019-05-14SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2019-05-14SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-05-10SenateRules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Appropriations with the report of Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs & Finance intact, on motion of Senator Cummings
2019-05-10SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Cummings
2019-05-07SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2019-05-07SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2019-05-07SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
2019-04-10SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
2019-04-05HousePassed
2019-04-05HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 92, Nays = 52
2019-04-05HouseRead Third time
2019-04-05HouseRep. Ralph of Hartland asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment
2019-04-05HouseRep. Ralph of Hartland moved to amend the bill
2019-04-05HouseWhich was disagreed to
2019-04-05HouseRep. Murphy of Fairfax moved to amend the bill
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-04-04HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 92, Nays = 52
2019-04-04HouseReport of Committee on Ways and Means as amended agreed to
2019-04-04HouseWhich was disagreed to
2019-04-04HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 55, Nays = 87
2019-04-04HouseRep. Browning of Arlington and Sullivan of Dorset moved to substitute an amendment
2019-04-04HouseReport of Committee on Ways and Means amended as offered by Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-04HouseReport of Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs substituted by Report of Committee on Ways and Means
2019-04-04HouseRep. Hooper of Montpelier recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2019-04-04HouseRep. Scheu of Middlebury recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
2019-04-04HouseRep. Stevens of Waterbury reported for the committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs
2019-04-04HouseRead Second Time
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2019-01-29HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback