VT H0104 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 23, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 23, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to professions and occupations regulated by the Office of Professional Regulation
Title
An act relating to professions and occupations regulated by the Office of Professional Regulation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 23, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | House | Signed by Governor on May 23, 2019 |
2019-05-17 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2019-05-08 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2019-05-07 | House | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Gannon of Wilmington |
2019-05-02 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Ashe, Bray, Clarkson, Collamore, Pollina, and White agreed to |
2019-05-01 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Clarkson, Bray, Collamore, Pollina, and White; text |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Ashe for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Clarkson for Committee on Government Operations |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Clarkson, Bray, Collamore, Pollina, and White |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-04-30 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Clarkson, Bray, Collamore, Pollina, and White |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-20 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-03-19 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-19 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations as amended agreed to |
2019-03-19 | House | Report of the Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-03-19 | House | Rep. Townsend of South Burlington recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-19 | House | Rep. Scheu of Middlebury recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2019-03-19 | House | Rep. Gannon of Wilmington reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-19 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2019-01-29 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |