VT H0101 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the implementation of 2018 Acts and Resolves No. 173 by providing grant funding to build systems-driven, sustainable literacy support for all students with measurable outcomes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the implementation of 2018 Acts and Resolves No. 173 by providing grant funding to build systems-driven, sustainable literacy support for all students with measurable outcomes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Education
2021-03-19HouseRead Third time and Passed
2021-03-18HouseThird Reading Ordered
2021-03-18HouseReport of Committee on Education as amended agreed to
2021-03-18HouseRep. Webb of Shelburne, Arrison of Weathersfield, Austin of Colchester, Brady of Williston, Brown of Richmond, Conlon of Cornwall, Cupoli of Rutland City, Hooper of Randolph, James of Manchester, Toof of St. Albans Town, and Williams of Granby moved to amend the report of the committee on Education, which was agreed to.
2021-03-18HouseReport of the Committee on Education amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations
2021-03-18HouseRep. Scheu of Middlebury recommended for the Committee on Appropriations
2021-03-18HouseRep. Webb of Shelburne reported for the Committee on Education
2021-03-18HouseRead Second Time
2021-03-10HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2021-01-20HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback