VT H0101 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Rep. Bouchard of Colchester moved to commit bill to the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs which was agreed to.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Voting Requirements In Common Ownership Communities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Voting Requirements In Common Ownership Communities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-17 Rep. Bouchard of Colchester moved to commit bill to the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs which was agreed to.
2011-03-16 Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Bouchard of Colchester
2011-03-15 Amendment of Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs agreed to and Third Reading Ordered
2011-03-11 Rep. Rep. Bouchard of Colchester reported for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs
2011-03-15 Read Second Time
2011-01-25 Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback