VT H0088 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Signed by Governor on June 1, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the use value appraisal program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the use value appraisal program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-21HouseSigned by Governor on June 1, 2021
2021-05-21HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 26, 2021
2021-05-21SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2021-05-19HouseSenate proposal of amendment concurred in
2021-05-19HouseRules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2021-05-18HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2021-05-18SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
2021-05-18SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2021-05-18SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2021-05-14Senate3rd reading ordered
2021-05-14SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to
2021-05-14SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture agreed to
2021-05-14SenateReported favorably by Senator Pearson for Committee on Finance with proposal of amendment
2021-05-14SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Parent for Committee on Agriculture
2021-05-14SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2021-05-14SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
2021-05-14SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2021-05-13SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2021-05-13SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
2021-05-13SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-04-15SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2021-04-15SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
2021-04-15SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-03-10SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture
2021-03-09HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2021-03-09HouseRead Third time and Passed
2021-03-09HouseRules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2021-03-09HouseThird Reading Ordered
2021-03-09HouseReport of Committee on Agriculture and Forestry agreed to
2021-03-09HouseRep. Canfield of Fair Haven recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means
2021-03-09HouseRep. Pearl of Danville reported for the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2021-03-09HouseRead Second Time
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2021-01-19HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback