VT H0077 | 2023-2024 | Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 1, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to Vermont’s adoption of the Physical Therapy Licensure Compact

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to Vermont’s adoption of the Physical Therapy Licensure Compact

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-12SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on June 1, 2023
2023-05-12HouseSigned by Governor on June 1, 2023
2023-05-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 26, 2023
2023-05-12SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2023-05-11HouseSenate proposal of amendment concurred in
2023-05-11HouseRules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2023-05-11HouseNotice Calendar: Senate Proposal of Amendment
2023-05-10HouseSenate Message: Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2023-05-10SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth
2023-05-10SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2023-05-10SenatePending third reading, Senator Weeks proposal of amendment, agreed to
2023-05-10SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Weeks
2023-05-10SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2023-05-09Senate3rd reading ordered
2023-05-09SenateReported favorably by Senator Perchlik for Committee on Appropriations
2023-05-09SenateReported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance
2023-05-09SenateReported favorably by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare
2023-05-09SenateRead 2nd time
2023-05-09SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2023-05-09SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2023-05-09SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2023-05-09SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2023-05-08SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2023-05-08SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2023-05-08SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2023-05-08SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2023-05-02SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2023-05-02SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2023-05-02SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2023-05-02SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2023-04-21SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2023-04-21SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2023-04-21SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2023-03-22SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare
2023-03-17HouseRead third time and passed
2023-03-17HouseAction Calendar: Third Reading
2023-03-16HouseThird Reading ordered
2023-03-16HouseReport of Committee on Ways and Means agreed to
2023-03-16HouseReport of Committee on Health Care agreed to
2023-03-16HouseRep. Toleno of Brattleboro recommended for the Committee on Appropriations
2023-03-16HouseRep. Andrews of Westford recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means
2023-03-16HouseRep. Peterson of Clarendon reported for the Committee on Health Care
2023-03-16HouseRead second time
2023-03-16HouseAction Calendar: Favorable with Amendment
2023-03-15HouseNotice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment
2023-02-17HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2023-02-17HouseNotice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment
2023-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2023-02-14HouseNotice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment
2023-01-20HouseRead first time and referred to the Committee on Health Care

Vermont State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/status/2024/H.77
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2024/Docs/BILLS/H-0077/H-0077%20As%20Introduced.pdf
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2024/Docs/BILLS/H-0077/H-0077%20As%20passed%20by%20the%20House%20Official.pdf
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2024/Docs/BILLS/H-0077/H-0077%20As%20Passed%20by%20Both%20House%20and%20Senate%20Official.pdf
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2024/Docs/ACTS/ACT035/ACT035%20As%20Enacted.pdf
Supplementhttps://ljfo.vermont.gov/assets/Publications/2022-2023-House-BIlls/63c2ad0e7d/H.77Nolan-LangweilFiscal-Note-As-Recommended-by-the-House-Committee-on-Ways-and-Means2-16-2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://ljfo.vermont.gov/assets/Publications/2022-2023-House-BIlls/4173a966af/GENERAL-367520-v3-2023_H77_PT_Compact.pdf
Supplementhttps://ljfo.vermont.gov/assets/Publications/2023-2024-House-BIlls/9513adddbd/GENERAL-367520-v5-2023_H77_PT_Compact-HOUSE-PASSED.pdf
Supplementhttps://ljfo.vermont.gov/assets/Publications/2023-2024-As-Passed-the-General-Assembly/dfc975f34b/GENERAL-367520-v6-2023_H77_PT_Compact-AS-PASSED-GA.pdf
Supplementhttps://ljfo.vermont.gov/assets/Publications/2023-2024-As-Passed-the-General-Assembly/eb113a7c56/GENERAL-367520-v7-2023_H77_PT_Compact.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback