VT H0074 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 23, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to domestic and sexual violence

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to domestic and sexual violence

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on May 23, 2017
2017-05-23HouseSigned by Governor on May 23, 2017
2017-05-17HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 17, 2017
2017-05-08SenateHouse message House adopted Conference Committee report
2017-05-04HouseCommittee of Conference report adopted (House bill)
2017-05-04HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2017-05-03SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2017-05-03SenateCommittee of Conference report adopted
2017-05-03SenateCommittee of Conference report submitted by Senator Sears for Committee, text
2017-05-03SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
2017-05-03SenateCommittee of Conference Report
2017-04-27SenateCommittee of Conference appointed: Senators Sears, Flory, and White
2017-04-26SenateHouse message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed
2017-04-26HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2017-04-26HouseSpeaker appointed Grad of Moretown, Morris of Bennington and Dickinson of St. Albans Town as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
2017-04-26HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Conquest of Newbury
2017-04-26HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment considered
2017-04-25HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-04-21SenatePassed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-04-21SenateProposal of amendment agreed to
2017-04-21SenateProposal of amendment by Senator(s) Benning; text
2017-04-21SenateRules suspended on motion of Senator Ashe to permit motion to reconsider prior vote of passage of the bill so as to allow a proposal of amendment after 3rd reading
2017-04-21SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-04-21SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Benning
2017-04-21SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-04-20Senate3rd reading ordered
2017-04-20SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2017-04-20SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
2017-04-20SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2017-04-20SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-04-19SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-22SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-17HouseRead Third time and Passed
2017-02-16HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-02-16HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary agreed to.
2017-02-16HouseRep. Conquest of Newbury reported for the committee on Judiciary
2017-02-16HouseRead Second Time
2017-01-19HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback