VT H0065 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Signed by Governor on 6/5/13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Limited Immunity From Liability For Reporting A Drug Or Alcohol Overdose

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Limited Immunity From Liability For Reporting A Drug Or Alcohol Overdose

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-15HouseSigned by Governor on 6/5/13
2013-05-14SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2013-05-10HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2013-05-10HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2013-05-09SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
2013-05-09SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2013-05-09SenateRules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Campbell
2013-05-09Senate3rd reading ordered
2013-05-09SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2013-05-09SenateSenator Sears requested & granted leave to withdraw the THIRD proposal of amendment
2013-05-09SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
2013-05-09SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2013-05-09SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2013-05-09SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2013-05-08SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2013-05-08SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2013-03-27SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2013-03-22HouseRead Third time and Passed
2013-03-22HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield agreed to
2013-03-21HouseAmendment of Committee on Judiciary agreed to and Third Reading Ordered
2013-03-20HouseRep. Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg reported for the committee on Judiciary
2013-03-21HouseRead Second Time
2013-03-19HouseRep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved to postpone action until 3/21/2013 which was agreed to
2013-01-23HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback