VT H0051 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-08 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-08 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Gold Star And Next-of-kin Registration Plates
Title
An Act Relating To Gold Star And Next-of-kin Registration Plates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-08 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-03 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2012-02-02 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-02-02 | Amendment of Committee on Transportation agreed to | |
2012-02-01 | Rep. Rep. Helm of Fair Haven, recommended for the committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-02 | Rep. Bohi of Hartford spoke for the committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-02 | Read Second Time | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) | |
2011-01-14 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Transportation |