VT H0048 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-14 - Senate Message, Adopted in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to authorizing alternative procedures for 2021 annual municipal meetings in response to COVID-19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to authorizing alternative procedures for 2021 annual municipal meetings in response to COVID-19

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-14HouseSenate Message, Adopted in concurrence
2021-01-14SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
2021-01-14SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence
2021-01-14SenateRules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Balint
2021-01-14SenateReported favorably by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2021-01-14SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint
2021-01-14SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2021-01-14SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-01-13SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
2021-01-12HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2021-01-12HouseRead Third time and Passed
2021-01-12HouseRules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2021-01-12HouseThird Reading Ordered
2021-01-12HouseReport of Committee on Government Operations agreed to.
2021-01-12HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Toof of St. Albans Town withdrawn
2021-01-12HouseRep. Toof of St. Albans Town moved to amend the report of the committee on Government Operations
2021-01-12HouseRep. Copeland Hanzas of Bradford reported for the committee on Government Operations
2021-01-12HouseRead Second Time
2021-01-07HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback