VT H0047 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 23, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the taxation of electronic cigarettes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the taxation of electronic cigarettes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-01 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 134, Nays = 6 (Y: 134 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on May 23, 2019
2019-05-23HouseSigned by Governor on May 23, 2019
2019-05-17HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 17, 2019
2019-05-13SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2019-05-10HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2019-05-08HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2019-05-08SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2019-05-08SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2019-05-08SenatePending third reading, Senate proposal of amendment amended as moved by Senator(s) Cummings, Balint, Brock, Campion, MacDonald, Pearson, and Sirotkin
2019-05-08SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-05-07Senate3rd reading ordered
2019-05-07SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to
2019-05-07SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Finance
2019-05-07SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2019-05-07SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2019-05-06SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2019-05-06SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-02-06SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
2019-02-01HousePassed
2019-02-01HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 134, Nays = 6
2019-02-01HouseRead Third time
2019-02-01HouseWhich was disagreed to
2019-02-01HouseRep. Gregoire of Fairfield moved to amend the bill
2019-01-31HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-01-31HouseRep. Till of Jericho recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-31HouseRead Second Time
2019-01-17HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback