VT H0046 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - House message: Governor approved bill on 5/17/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - House message: Governor approved bill on 5/17/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to miscellaneous provisions of mental health law
Title
An act relating to miscellaneous provisions of mental health law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on 5/17/2021 |
2021-05-17 | House | Signed by Governor on May 17, 2021 |
2021-05-11 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 11, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2021-05-04 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2021-04-30 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2021-04-29 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2021-04-28 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2021-04-28 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |
2021-03-17 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2021-03-16 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2021-03-16 | House | Report of Committee on Health Care agreed to |
2021-03-16 | House | Rep. Donahue of Northfield reported for the Committee on Health Care |
2021-03-16 | House | Read Second time |
2021-01-07 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Health Care |