VT H0039 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Baruth
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the extension of the deadline of school district mergers required by the State Board of Education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the extension of the deadline of school district mergers required by the State Board of Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 134, Nays = 10 (Y: 134 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 69, Nays = 74 (Y: 69 N: 74 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Baruth
2019-03-22SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-22SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education
2019-03-22SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-03-19SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2019-03-19SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education
2019-03-19SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-02-08SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Education
2019-02-07HousePassed
2019-02-07HouseRead Third time
2019-02-07HouseRules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2019-02-07HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-02-07HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Conlon of Cornwall, Cupoli of Rutland City, and Webb of Shelburne agreed to
2019-02-07HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 134, Nays = 10
2019-02-07HouseWhich was agreed to
2019-02-07HouseRep. Conlon of Cornwall, Cupoli of Rutland City, and Webb of Shelburne moved to amend the amendment offered by Rep. Conlon of Cornwall, Cupoli of Rutland City, and Webb of Shelburne
2019-02-07HouseRep. Conlon of Cornwall, Cupoli of Rutland City, and Webb of Shelburne moved to amend the bill
2019-02-06HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Scheuermann of Stowe disagreed to
2019-02-06HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 69, Nays = 74
2019-02-06HouseRep. Scheuermann of Stowe moved to amend the bill
2019-02-06HouseWhich was disagreed to
2019-02-06HouseRep. Donovan of Burlington raised a Point of Order
2019-02-06HouseRep. Conlon of Cornwall reported for the committee on Education
2019-02-06HouseRead Second Time
2019-02-05HouseAction Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Webb of Shelburne
2019-01-17HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback