VT H0035 | 2023-2024 | Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 25, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the Victims Assistance Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the Victims Assistance Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-26SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on April 25, 2023
2023-04-25HouseSigned by Governor on April 25, 2023
2023-04-19HouseDelivered to the Governor on April 19, 2023
2023-04-18HouseSenate Message: Passed in concurrence
2023-04-14SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence
2023-04-14SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2023-04-13SenateReported favorably by Senator Norris for Committee on Judiciary, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2023-04-13SenateFavorable report by Committee on Judiciary
2023-04-13SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2023-04-12SenateFavorable report by Committee on Judiciary
2023-04-12SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2023-02-17SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2023-02-16HouseRead third time and passed
2023-02-16HouseAction Calendar: Third Reading
2023-02-15HouseThird Reading ordered
2023-02-15HouseRep. Chapin of East Montpelier reported for the Committee on Judiciary
2023-02-15HouseRead second time
2023-02-15HouseAction Calendar: Favorable
2023-02-14HouseNotice Calendar: Favorable
2023-01-10HouseRead first time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback