VT H0029 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 5 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Rep Lippert of Hinesburg moved to recommit the bill to the Committee on Health Care which was agreed to
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 5 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Rep Lippert of Hinesburg moved to recommit the bill to the Committee on Health Care which was agreed to
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to permitting Medicare supplemental plans to offer expense discounts
Title
An act relating to permitting Medicare supplemental plans to offer expense discounts
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Trieber [D] | Rep. Heidi Scheuermann [R] | Rep. Gary Nolan [R] | Rep. Carol Ode [D] |
Rep. Oliver Olsen [D] | Rep. Carolyn Partridge [D] | Rep. Kurt Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-05 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Ayer, Failed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 11, Nays = 18 (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | House | Rep Lippert of Hinesburg moved to recommit the bill to the Committee on Health Care which was agreed to |
2017-05-05 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Roll Call, requested by Senator Ayer, Failed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 11, Nays = 18 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Proposal of amendment not agreed to |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Ayer, White, Balint, Branagan, Bray, Collamore, Clarkson, Flory, and McCormack motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Division of the Senate Yeas 12, Nays 14 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Proposal of amendment not agreed to |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) White, Ayer, Balint, Benning, Branagan, Clarkson, Collamore, Flory, Mazza, Nitka, Rodgers, Starr, and Westman motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment, as amended, agreed to |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Pending third reading Senator White motion to amend 2nd proposal of amendment by Senator Sirotkin, agreed to |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Sirotkin motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2017-05-05 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Finance |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Sirotkin |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-03-22 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2017-03-21 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-03-21 | House | Report of Committee on Health Care agreed to. |
2017-03-21 | House | Rep. Jickling of Brookfield reported for the committee on Health Care |
2017-03-21 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-01-11 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care |