VT H0027 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-12 - Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-12 - Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to eliminating the statute of limitations on prosecutions for sexual assault
Title
An act relating to eliminating the statute of limitations on prosecutions for sexual assault
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-12 | House | Senate message, report of committee of conference adopted |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Sears for Committee, text |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Sears |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Ashe, Sears, and Ingram |
2018-04-27 | Senate | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2018-04-25 | House | Speaker appointed Webb of Shelburne, Joseph of North Hero and Mattos of Milton as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2018-04-25 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Sharpe of Bristol |
2018-04-24 | House | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Sharpe of Bristol |
2018-04-20 | House | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Lalonde of South Burlington |
2018-04-18 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-04-17 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-04-13 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary, as amended, agreed to |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary amended as recommended by Committee on Education |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Benning for Committee on Education with proposal of amendment |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-13 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Committed to Committee on Education with report of Committee on Judiciary intact, under suspension of Senate Rule 49, on motion of Senator Sears |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-17 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2017-02-16 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-02-16 | House | Report of Committee on Judiciary agreed to. |
2017-02-16 | House | Rep. Morris of Bennington reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-16 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-01-11 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |