VT H0027 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-12 - Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to eliminating the statute of limitations on prosecutions for sexual assault

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to eliminating the statute of limitations on prosecutions for sexual assault

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-12SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-12HouseSenate message, report of committee of conference adopted
2018-05-12SenateCommittee of Conference report adopted
2018-05-12SenateCommittee of Conference report submitted by Senator Sears for Committee, text
2018-05-12SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Sears
2018-04-27SenateCommittee of Conference appointed: Senators Ashe, Sears, and Ingram
2018-04-27SenateHouse message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed
2018-04-25HouseSpeaker appointed Webb of Shelburne, Joseph of North Hero and Mattos of Milton as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
2018-04-25HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Sharpe of Bristol
2018-04-24HouseAction Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Sharpe of Bristol
2018-04-20HouseAction Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Lalonde of South Burlington
2018-04-18HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-04-17SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-04-17SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-04-13Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-04-13SenateProposal of amendment  by Committee on Judiciary, as amended, agreed to
2018-04-13SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary amended as recommended by Committee on Education
2018-04-13SenateReported favorably by Senator Benning for Committee on Education with proposal of amendment
2018-04-13SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
2018-04-13SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education
2018-04-13SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-04-13SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-04-12SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education
2018-04-12SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-04-12SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-04-06SenateCommitted to Committee on Education with report of Committee on Judiciary intact, under suspension of Senate Rule 49, on motion of Senator Sears
2017-02-22SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-17HouseRead Third time and Passed
2017-02-16HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-02-16HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary agreed to.
2017-02-16HouseRep. Morris of Bennington reported for the committee on Judiciary
2017-02-16HouseRead Second Time
2017-01-11HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback