VT H0025 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Delivered to the Governor on May 16, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to domestic terrorism

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to domestic terrorism

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 16, 2018
2018-05-07HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2018-05-07HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment considered
2018-05-03HouseSenate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto
2018-05-03SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-03SenateRoll Call, requested by Senator Ashe,  Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0
2018-05-03SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment as moved by Senator(s) Sears
2018-05-03SenateSenator Sears moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text
2018-05-03SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text
2018-05-03SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Sears
2018-05-03SenateHouse message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment
2018-05-02HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2018-05-03SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment
2018-05-03SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-05-02HouseWhich was agreed to
2018-05-02HouseRep. Conquest of Newbury, Burditt of West Rutland, Colburn of Burlington, Dickinson of St. Albans Town, Grad of Moretown, Jessup of Middlesex, Lalonde of South Burlington, Morris of Bennington, Rachelson of Burlington, Viens of Newport City, and Willhoit of St. Johnsbury moved to concur with the Senate Proposal of Amendment to the House Proposal of Amendment with a further amendment thereto
2018-04-27HouseAction postponed until May 2, 2018 as moved by Rep. Conquest of Newbury
2018-04-25HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-04-25SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Sears
2018-04-25SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-04-25SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-04-24Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0
2018-04-24SenateProposal of amendment  by Committee on Judiciary, as amended, agreed to
2018-04-24SenateMotion agreed to
2018-04-24SenateSenator(s) Sears motion to amend Committee on Judiciary proposal of amendment; text
2018-04-24SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
2018-04-24SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears
2018-04-24SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-04-24SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-04-20SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears
2018-04-20SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-04-20SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2017-02-22SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-17HouseRead Third time and Passed
2017-02-17HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-02-17HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the bill
2017-02-16HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-02-16HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary agreed to.
2017-02-16HouseRep. Rachelson of Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary
2017-02-16HouseRead Second Time
2017-01-11HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback