VT H0024 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on 5/17/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on 5/17/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Maintenance And Conveyance Of Maidstone Lake Road
Title
An Act Relating To The Maintenance And Conveyance Of Maidstone Lake Road
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Signed by Governor on 5/17/2011 | |
2011-05-06 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/13/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Passed the House and Senate on 5/4/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Carris | |
2011-05-04 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence | |
2011-05-04 | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Carris | |
2011-05-04 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2011-05-04 | Reported favorably by Senator Hartwell for Committee on Institutions | |
2011-05-04 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-04 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-04 | Favorable report by Committee on Institutions | |
2011-05-04 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Institutions on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-15 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-04-13 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2011-04-12 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-04-12 | Amendment of Committee on Corrections and Institutions agreed to | |
2011-04-08 | Rep. Rep. South of St. Johnsbury reported for the committee on Corrections and Institutions | |
2011-04-12 | Read Second Time | |
2011-01-11 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Corrections and Institutions |