VT H0020 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 29, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 29, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to pretrial risk assessments and pretrial services
Title
An act relating to pretrial risk assessments and pretrial services
Sponsors
Rep. Maxine Grad [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on April 29, 2021 |
2021-04-29 | House | Signed by Governor on April 29, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | House | Delivered to the Governor on April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2021-04-14 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2021-04-09 | House | Rep. Grad of Moretown moved to postpone action until April 14, 2021 which was agreed to |
2021-04-07 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2021-04-06 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2021-04-02 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-04-02 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-09 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2021-02-05 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2021-02-05 | House | Report of Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2021-02-05 | House | Rep. Donnally of Hyde Park reported for the Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-05 | House | Read Second time |
2021-01-07 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary |