VT H0016 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to boards and commissions
Title
An act relating to boards and commissions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 68 of 135 to Pass -- Yeas = 48, Nays = 87 (Y: 48 N: 87 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Hooker, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 2 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Hooker, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 2 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 17, 2019 |
2019-06-17 | House | Signed by Governor on June 17, 2019 |
2019-06-11 | House | Delivered to the Governor on June 11, 2019 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2019-05-17 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2019-05-17 | House | Rep. LaClair of Barre Town moved to concur in the Senate prop of amend with a further amend thereto |
2019-05-17 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2019-05-17 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 68 of 135 to Pass -- Yeas = 48, Nays = 87 |
2019-05-17 | House | Rep. Harrison of Chittenden moved that the House concur in the Senate proposal of amendment with a further amendment thereto |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2019-05-15 | House | Action postponed until May 17, 2019 as moved by Rep. Copeland-Hanzas of Bradford |
2019-05-13 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Proposal of amendment not agreed to |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Sirotkin motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) White, Bray, Clarkson, Collamore, and Pollina motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sirotkin |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) White, Bray, Clarkson, Collamore, and Pollina |
2019-05-13 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-05-10 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Roll Call, requested by Senator Hooker, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 2 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Ashe for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-05-10 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2019-02-01 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-02-01 | House | Which was agreed to |
2019-02-01 | House | Rep. McCormack of Burlington moved to amend the bill |
2019-01-31 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-01-31 | House | Which was agreed to |
2019-01-31 | House | Rep. McCullough of Williston moved to amend the bill |
2019-01-31 | House | Which was agreed to |
2019-01-31 | House | Rep. Gannon of Wilmington recommended for the committee on Government Operations |
2019-01-31 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-01-11 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |