VT H0016 | 2018 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-01 - House message: Governor allowed to become law without signature on July 1, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-01 - House message: Governor allowed to become law without signature on July 1, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to making appropriations for the support of government, financing education, and vital records
Title
An act relating to making appropriations for the support of government, financing education, and vital records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 63 of 125 to Pass -- Yeas = 40, Nays = 85 (Y: 40 N: 85 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2018-06-25 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 63 of 125 to Pass -- Yeas = 51, Nays = 74 (Y: 51 N: 74 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2018-06-22 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 54 of 107 to Pass -- Yeas = 46, Nays = 61 (Y: 46 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 42) [FAIL]
2018-06-22 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 56 of 110 to Pass -- Yeas = 42, Nays = 68 (Y: 42 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 39) [FAIL]
2018-06-22 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 59 of 117 to Pass -- Yeas = 94, Nays = 23 (Y: 94 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Proposal of amendment agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 63 of 125 to Pass -- Yeas = 51, Nays = 74 (Y: 51 N: 74 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2018-06-22 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 54 of 107 to Pass -- Yeas = 46, Nays = 61 (Y: 46 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 42) [FAIL]
2018-06-22 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 56 of 110 to Pass -- Yeas = 42, Nays = 68 (Y: 42 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 39) [FAIL]
2018-06-22 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 59 of 117 to Pass -- Yeas = 94, Nays = 23 (Y: 94 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Proposal of amendment agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Senate | House message: Governor allowed to become law without signature on July 1, 2018 |
2018-07-01 | House | Allowed to go into effect without the signature of the Governor on July 1, 2018 |
2018-06-25 | House | Delivered to the Governor on June 25, 2018 |
2018-06-25 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-06-25 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2018-06-25 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-06-25 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment |
2018-06-25 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Toll of Danville |
2018-06-25 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2018-06-25 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 63 of 125 to Pass -- Yeas = 40, Nays = 85 |
2018-06-25 | House | Rep. Browning of Arlington moved to amend the proposal of amend offered by Rep. Toll of Danville |
2018-06-25 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2018-06-25 | House | Rep. Beck of St. Johnsbury moved to substitute an amendment |
2018-06-25 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2018-06-25 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 63 of 125 to Pass -- Yeas = 51, Nays = 74 |
2018-06-25 | House | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to substitute an amendment |
2018-06-25 | House | Rep. Turner of Milton moved that the House reconsider its vote, which was agreed to. |
2018-06-22 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Toll of Danville |
2018-06-22 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2018-06-22 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 54 of 107 to Pass -- Yeas = 46, Nays = 61 |
2018-06-22 | House | Rep. Scheuermann of Stowe moved to amend the amendment offered by Rep. Toll of Danville |
2018-06-22 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2018-06-22 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 56 of 110 to Pass -- Yeas = 42, Nays = 68 |
2018-06-22 | House | Rep. Browning of Arlington, Sullivan of Dorset, and Wright of Burlington moved to substitute an amendment |
2018-06-22 | House | Rep. Toll of Danville moved that the House concur in the Senate proposal of amendment with a further amendment thereto |
2018-06-22 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2018-06-22 | House | Ruling of the Chair was challenged by Rep. Poirier of Barre City which ruling was upheld. |
2018-06-22 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 59 of 117 to Pass -- Yeas = 94, Nays = 23 |
2018-06-22 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2018-06-22 | House | Rep. Poirier of Barre City raised a Point of Order |
2018-06-22 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2018-06-22 | House | Rep. Poirier of Barre City raised a Point of Order |
2018-06-22 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2018-06-21 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0 |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Baruth; text |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0 |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Kitchel, Cummings, Baruth, Ashe, Benning, Branagan, Bray, Brock, Campion, Lyons, MacDonald, McCormack, Nitka, Sirotkin, Starr, and Westman; text |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Ashe for Committee on Rules |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Kitchel, Cummings, Baruth, Ashe, Benning, Branagan, Bray, Brock, Campion, Lyons, MacDonald, McCormack, Nitka, Sirotkin, Starr, and Westman |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Rules |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-06-19 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-06-19 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2018-06-19 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-06-19 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-06-19 | House | Rep. Devereux of Mount Holly spoke for the committee on Government Operations |
2018-06-19 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-06-19 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-06-19 | House | Committee Bill read first time |