VT H0001 | 2018 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to sexual exploitation of a person in law enforcement officer custody

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to sexual exploitation of a person in law enforcement officer custody

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
2018-06-19HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2018-06-19HousePassed
2018-06-19HouseRead Third time
2018-06-19HouseRules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2018-06-19HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-06-19HouseRep. Colburn of Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary
2018-06-19HouseRead Second Time
2018-05-30HouseAction postponed until June 6, 2018 as moved by Rep. Colburn of Burlington
2018-05-23HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback