VT H0001 | 2018 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to sexual exploitation of a person in law enforcement officer custody
Title
An act relating to sexual exploitation of a person in law enforcement officer custody
Sponsors
Rep. Maxine Grad [D] | Rep. Ann Pugh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-06-19 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-06-19 | House | Passed |
2018-06-19 | House | Read Third time |
2018-06-19 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-06-19 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-06-19 | House | Rep. Colburn of Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2018-06-19 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-05-30 | House | Action postponed until June 6, 2018 as moved by Rep. Colburn of Burlington |
2018-05-23 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |