VA SR95 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Bill text as passed Senate (SR95ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Bill text as passed Senate (SR95ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorative commission; Old Senate Chamber; statue of Booker T. Washington. Expresses the Senate of Virginia's support for and calls upon the Chairman of the Senate Committee on Rules to establish a commemorative commission to honor Booker T. Washington with a statue in the Old Senate Chamber. Commemorative commission; Old Senate Chamber; statue of Booker T. Washington. Expresses the Senate of Virginia's support for and calls upon the Chairman of the Senate Committee on Rules to establish a commemorative commission to honor Booker T. Washington with a statue in the Old Senate Chamber.
Title
Washington, Booker T.; establishes commemorative commission to honor w/statue in Old Senate Chamber.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate (SR95ER) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21103126D-E |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SR95E |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 21103126D |