VA SR91 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on January 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-27 - Bill text as passed Senate (SR91ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on January 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-27 - Bill text as passed Senate (SR91ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing the censure of the Senate. Expresses the censure of the Senate of Virginia for Senator Amanda F. Chase.
Title
Senator Amanda F. Chase; expresses the censure of the Senate of Virginia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (24-Y 9-N) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Ruling of Chair Not Sustained (8-Y 29-N) (Y: 8 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Ruling of Chair Not Sustained (8-Y 29-N) (Y: 8 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate (SR91ER) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate (24-Y 9-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Ruling of Chair Not Sustained (8-Y 29-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Chair rules Resolution is not properly before Senate |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reading waived (38-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SR91S1 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Bell agreed to 21103239D-S1 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 21103239D-S1 (Bell) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 21102854D |