VA SR79 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Nominating a person to be elected as a justice of the Supreme Court of Virginia.
Title
Judge; nomination for election to Supreme Court of Virginia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2016-03-11 | Senate | No further action taken |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 16106249D |