VA SR43 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Nominating a person to be elected to the Court of Appeals of Virginia.
Title
Judge; nomination for election to Court of Appeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2016-03-11 | Senate | No further action taken |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 16105403D-E |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SR43E |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (8-Y 5-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Recommitted to Courts of Justice |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 16105403D |