VA SR143 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Bill text as passed Senate (SR143ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Confirming appointments to the Senate Ethics Advisory Panel. Confirms appointments made by the Senate Committee on Rules to the Senate Ethics Advisory Panel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Ethics Advisory Panel; confirming appointments by Senate Committee on Rules.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09SenateBill text as passed Senate (SR143ER)
2019-02-23SenateAgreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23SenateReading waived (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23SenateEngrossed by Senate
2019-02-23SenateReading waived (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23SenateRead first time
2019-02-22SenateReported from Rules (11-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-02-19SenatePresented and ordered printed 19106928D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback