VA SJR98 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ98ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ98ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Confirming Governor's appointments of certain persons. Confirms appointments to various positions made by Governor McDonnell and communicated to the General Assembly December 1, 2011.
Title
Governor; confirming appointments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ98ER) | |
2012-02-07 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | House: Agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | House: Taken up | |
2012-02-03 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-02-02 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-02 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 12101374D-E | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ98E | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Assigned to P&E sub: Certificate, Oath and Confirmation | |
2012-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-01-13 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12101374D |