VA SJR83 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Medical Assistance Services and Department of Social Services; conferral of authority to local departments of social services to investigate Medicaid fraud cases; report. Requests that the Department of Medical Assistance Services (DMAS) and the Department of Social Services consult with all relevant stakeholders and (i) analyze the potential benefits and issues of allowing local departments of social services (local departments) to investigate cases of suspected fraud that involve Medicaid and any other public assistance program administered in whole or in part by the local departments, including the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program; (ii) identify the most efficient methods of implementing the conferral of such authority to local departments; and (iii) analyze whether local departments should be permitted to collect a percentage of the funds recovered in cases investigated by such local departments that involve Medicaid and another public assistance program administered in whole or in part by local departments. The provisions of the resolution are contingent on the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services issuing guidance on whether the costs associated with this study are available for federal financial participation.
Title
Medicaid fraud cases; DMAS, et al., to study conferral of authority to local departments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Left in Rules |
2016-02-22 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 16103147D-E |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ83E |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103147D |