VA SJR80 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ80ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

National Prosthodontics Awareness Week. Designates April 19-25 in 2020 and the final full week in April in each succeeding year, as National Prosthodontics Awareness Week in Virginia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Prosthodontics Awareness Week.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SJ80ER)
2020-02-26SenateHouse amendments agreed to by Senate
2020-02-24HouseVOTE: Adoption (99-Y 1-N)
2020-02-24HouseAgreed to by House with amendments (99-Y 1-N)
2020-02-24HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2020-02-24HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-24HouseTaken up
2020-02-24HouseMotion to reconsider pass by for the day agreed to
2020-02-24HousePassed by for the day
2020-02-19HouseReported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2020-02-11SenateReading waived (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-10SenateReading waived (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07SenateReported from Rules by voice vote
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-01-17SenatePresented and ordered printed 20105561D

Same As/Similar To

HJ104 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback