VA SJR68 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ68ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ68ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Puppy Mill Awareness Month. Designates December, in 2020 and in each succeeding year, as Puppy Mill Awareness Month in Virginia.
Title
Puppy Mill Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Sen. Lynwood Lewis [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. Barbara Favola [D] | Sen. Jennifer Kiggans [R] |
Sen. Dave Marsden [D] | Sen. William Stanley [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ68ER) |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Taken up |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20104213D |