VA SJR66 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-26 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ66ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending the W.T. Woodson High School boys' basketball team.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending the W.T. Woodson High School boys' basketball team.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-26SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SJ66ER)
2018-01-26HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2018-01-19HouseLaid on Speaker's table
2018-01-19HouseReceived
2018-01-18SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2018-01-18SenateEngrossed by Senate
2018-01-12SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2018-01-12SenatePresented 18104999D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback