VA SJR61 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-19 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ61ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-19 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ61ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; strategies for preventing and mitigating potential damages caused by geomagnetic disturbances and electromagnetic pulses; report. Directs the Joint Commission on Technology and Science (JCOTS) to study the nature and magnitude of potential threats caused by geomagnetic disturbances and electromagnetic pulses, examine the Commonwealth's vulnerabilities to such threats, and recommend strategies to protect the Commonwealth's infrastructure from geomagnetic disturbances and electromagnetic pulses. The resolution requests that JCOTS report its findings and recommendations no later than the first day of the 2015 Regular Session.
Title
Geomagnetic disturbances & electromagnetic pulses; joint commission to study preventing damages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ61ER) |
2014-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | House | Agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | House | Taken up |
2014-02-17 | House | Reported from Science and Technology (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Science and Technology |
2014-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100988D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Science and Technology
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Science and Technology
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports