VA SJR55 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ55ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ55ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 150th anniversary of the ratification of the Fifteenth Amendment to the Constitution of the United States. Commemorates the 150th anniversary of the ratification of the Fifteenth Amendment to the Constitution of the United States. This resolution is a recommendation of the Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. Memorial Commission.
Title
Commemorating the 150th anniversary of the ratification of the Fifteenth Amendment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ55ER) |
2020-03-03 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2020-03-03 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2020-03-03 | House | Received |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/08/20 20103492D |