VA SJR491 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ491ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending Henry W. McLaughlin. Commends Henry W. McLaughlin for his remarkable devotion to the law and ceaseless labor to ensure equal justice and access to quality legal services for the poor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending Henry W. McLaughlin.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-07 Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ491ER)
2011-02-25 House: Agreed to by House by voice vote
2011-02-24 House: Laid on Speaker's table
2011-02-24 House: Received
2011-02-24 Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
2011-02-24 Senate: Engrossed by Senate
2011-02-22 Senate: Introduced bill reprinted 11105293D
2011-02-16 Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk
2011-02-16 Senate: Presented 11105293D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback