VA SJR47 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ47ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ47ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting the Jones Act. Expresses the sense of the General Assembly in supporting the Jones Act.
Title
Jones Act; expresses sense of the General Assembly to support Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Sen. Louise Lucas [D] |
Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Sen. Scott Surovell [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (65-Y 33-N) (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 2-N) (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 2-N) (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ47ER) |
2022-03-08 | House | VOTE: Adoption (65-Y 33-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Agreed to by House (65-Y 33-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Taken up |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from Rules (16-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (28-Y 12-N) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22103402D |